At a glance
Below is the current membership roster for the Board of Scientific Counselors, Infectious Diseases.
Designated Federal Officer
Sarah Wiley, MPH
Senior Advisor
National Center for Emerging and Zoonotic Infectious Diseases
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Membership
Lauren Meyers, PhD (Chair)
Professor, Departments of Integrative Biology and Statistics and Statistics and Data Sciences
Director, UT COVID-19 Modeling Consortium
The University of Texas at Austin
Austin, TX
Term: 07/01/2022 – 09/30/2025
Allison E. Aiello, PhD, MS
Director and Chief Medical Officer,
Columbia University Irving Medical Center, Mailman School of Public Health
Department of Epidemiology
Robert N. Butler Columbia Aging Center
New York, NY
Term: 02/14/2024 – 09/30/2027
Josh Barocas, MD
Associate Professor of Medicine
Director, Social Determinants of Health and Disparities Modeling Unit
University of Colorado School of Medicine, Divisions of General Internal Medicine
Aurora, CO
Term: 02/13/2023 – 09/30/2026
Virginia Caine, MD
Director and Chief Medical Officer
Marion County Public Health Department
Bicentennial Associate Professor of Medicine, Indiana University School of Medicine
Indianapolis, IN
Term: 07/01/2022 – 09/30/2025
Angela M. Caliendo, MD
Professor and Executive Vice Chair of Medicine
Warren Alpert Medical School
Brown University and Infectious Diseases Consultant
Rhode Island Hospital
Providence, RI
Term: 03/04/2024– 09/30/2027
Tri D. Do, MD
Chief Medical Officer
Community Health Center Network
San Leandro, CA
Term: 03/07/2024 – 09/30/2026
Jeffrey S. Duchin, MD
Chief, Communicable Disease Epidemiology and Immunization Section, Public Health – Seattle and King County
Professor of Medicine, Division of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, University of Washington School of Medicine
Seattle, WA
Term: 07/01/2022 – 09/30/2024
Anthony R. Flores, MD, PhD, MPH
Professor of Pediatrics
Director, Division of Pediatrics Infectious Diseases
Vanderbilt University Medical Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Nashville, TN
Term: 02/14/2024 – 09/30/2027
Christine G. Hahn, M.D.
State Epidemiologist and Medical Director
Division of Public Health
Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Boise, ID
Term: 02/14/2024 – 09/30/2026
Anil T. Mangla, PhD, MPH, FRIPH
Director of Disease Surveillance and Control
Southern Nevada Health District
Las Vegas, NV
Term: 02/20/2024 – 09/30/2027
Ilhem Messaoudi, PhD
Professor and Chair
Department of Microbiology, Immunology
and Molecular Genetics
College of Medicine
University of Kentucky
Lexington, KY
Term: 11/10/2020 – 09/30/2024
Bisola O. Ojikutu, MD, MPH, FIDSA
Commissioner of Public Health, City of Boston
Executive Director, Boston Public Health Commission
Associate Professor of Medicine
Harvard Medical School
Boston, MA
Term: 02/16/2024 – 09/30/2026
Trish M. Perl, MD, MSc
Professor
Public Health and Infectious Diseases and Geographic Medicine
Associate Dean for Faculty Affairs
O'Donnell School of Public Health UTSouthwestern Medical Center
Dallas, TX
Term: 02/14/2024 – 09/30/2026
Susan Sarah Philip, MD, MPH
Health Officer
City and County of San Francisco
San Francisco, CA
Term: 07/01/2022 – 09/30/2025
Thomas E. Wittum, PhD
Professor
Department of Veterinary Preventive Medicine, College of Medicine
The Ohio State University
Columbus, OH
Term: 02/14/2024 – 09/30/2027
Ex Officio Members
Joseph G. Toerner, MD, MPH
Director
Division of Hepatology and Nutrition
Food and Drug Administration
Silver Spring, MD
Emily Erbelding, MD, MPH
Director
Division of Microbiology and Infectious Diseases
National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases
National Institutes of Health
Rockville, MD
Office of Infectious Disease and HIV/AIDS Policy
Appointment pending
Liaison Representatives
Christine Markham, PhD
CDC/HRSA Advisory Committee on HIV, Viral Hepatitis and STD Prevention and Treatment (CHAC)
Professor of Health Promotion and Behavioral Sciences
Center for Health Promotion and Prevention Research
The University of Texas School of Public Health
Houston, TX
Erica Shenoy, MD, PhD
Healthcare Infection Control Practices Advisory Committee (HICPAC)
Associate Professor
Harvard Medical School
Chief of Infection Control, Mass General Brigham
Massachusetts General Hospital
Boston, MA
Lynn Sosa-Bergeron, MD
Advisory Committee for the Elimination of Tuberculosis (ACET)
Medical Director, Tuberculosis and Sexually Transmitted Diseases Programs, Connecticut Department of Public Health
Hartford, CT
Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices (ACIP)
Appointment pending
Hugo López-Gatell Ramírez, MD, PhD, MS
Secretariat of Health of Mexico
Undersecretary of Disease Prevention and Health Promotion
Secretariat of Health of Mexico
Ciudad de México, MX
Donald Sheppard, MD
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC)
Vice President Infectious Diseases and Vaccination Programs Branch
Public Health Agency of Canada Government of Canada
Ottawa, ON